IL HB4949 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for any person to engage in misleading or false advertising or promotion that misrepresents the need to seek mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment outside of the State of Illinois. Requires any marketing, advertising, promotional, or sales materials directed to Illinois residents concerning mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment to (i) prominently display or announce the full physical address of the treatment program or facility; (ii) include a link to the Internet website for the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health and Division of Alcoholism and Substance Abuse; and (iii) provide that mental health disorder and substance use disorder treatment may be available at a reduced cost or for free for Illinois residents. Prohibits arrangements under which a patient seeking mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment is referred to a mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment program or facility in exchange for a fee or other remuneration. Amends the Health Care Worker Self-Referral Act. Provides that a violation of any provision of the Act constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a violation of the Act's prohibition against fee splitting constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER FRAUD-MENTAL HLTH ADS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-17HouseArrived in House
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 020-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 021-000-000
2018-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254755New CodeSee Bill Text
2256022.2Amended CodeCitation Text
8155052VVVNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback