IL HB4949 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for any person to engage in misleading or false advertising or promotion that misrepresents the need to seek mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment outside of the State of Illinois. Requires any marketing, advertising, promotional, or sales materials directed to Illinois residents concerning mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment to (i) prominently display or announce the full physical address of the treatment program or facility; (ii) include a link to the Internet website for the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health and Division of Alcoholism and Substance Abuse; and (iii) provide that mental health disorder and substance use disorder treatment may be available at a reduced cost or for free for Illinois residents. Prohibits arrangements under which a patient seeking mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment is referred to a mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment program or facility in exchange for a fee or other remuneration. Amends the Health Care Worker Self-Referral Act. Provides that a violation of any provision of the Act constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a violation of the Act's prohibition against fee splitting constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-MENTAL HLTH ADS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1058 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 021-000-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 47 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 22.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2VVV | New Code | See Bill Text |