IL HB4948 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the penalties for stalking, aggravated stalking, and cyberstalking by one class if the victim of the offense is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-STALKING-VICTIM<18

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-7.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-7.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback