IL HB4948 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the penalties for stalking, aggravated stalking, and cyberstalking by one class if the victim of the offense is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense.
Title
CRIM CD-STALKING-VICTIM<18
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4948&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4948.htm |