IL HB4944 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a vehicle weighing 10,000 pounds to 26,000 pounds (rather than only a truck tractor in combination with a semitrailer) shall be subject to a safety test at an official testing station at least every 12 months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VEH SAFETY TEST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-014-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625513-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback