IL HB4936 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0908
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that notwithstanding any State licensing law to the contrary, the Department of Human Services shall adopt rules, which shall be implemented within 6 months after the effective date of the bill, that would allow a person who has completed a psychiatric training program certification from any branch of the United States Armed Forces with at least one year of experience in a mental health setting to be recognized as a mental health professional for purposes of programs authorized or funded by the Department under the standards of practice and under the direction of a licensed mental health professional as authorized by the Department. Defines "licensed mental health professional".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-DHS-MENTAL HLTH PROFESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0908
2018-08-17HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017055.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4936&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4936.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4936eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4936enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0908.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4936ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4936sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4936_04202018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4936_05242018_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4936sam001_05312018_070000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback