IL HB4932 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a request for an arrest report or criminal history record must be made to the public body that created the public record being sought. Provides that a public body that merely maintains a copy of the public record being sought shall not release the public record. Provides that if a public body receives a request for a public record that it did not create, the public body shall direct the requester to the public body that created the public record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-ARREST/CRIMINAL RECORDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenateSponsorship Change Request Approved Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSponsorship Change Request Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateRequest for Sponsorship Change Filed - Pursuant to Senate Rule 5-1
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-005-001
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51402.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback