IL HB4927 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Requires the school district to provide all copies of teacher evaluations to the exclusive bargaining representative of the school district's teachers within 7 days after issuing the evaluations.
Title
SCH CD-CHI-TEACHER EVALUATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0682 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-008-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-004-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-018-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-001-001 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |