IL HB4927 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Requires the school district to provide all copies of teacher evaluations to the exclusive bargaining representative of the school district's teachers within 7 days after issuing the evaluations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CHI-TEACHER EVALUATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0682
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-008-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Education; 009-004-000
2018-05-21SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-18SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-018-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-001-001
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105534-85dNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback