IL HB4923 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Governor Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Act. Provides that an investment option may be a conservative fund rather than a conservative principal protection fund. Provides that the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Board may establish deadlines for payment of payroll deductions to the Fund. Provides for audits on a fiscal year basis rather than a calendar year basis and report by the following January rather than July. Requires the Treasurer to prepare annual reports on benefits provided by the Program and post the report on the Program website. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS OPTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8208045Amended CodeCitation Text
8208065Amended CodeCitation Text
8208080Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback