IL HB4922 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to offer to consumers at retail a rebate made on a stored-value card that charges dormancy fees or other post-issuance fees. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONS FRAUD REBATE STORED VALUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-06-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-003-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-044-000
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-20HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052LLLAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback