IL HB4922 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act. Expands the scope of the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Review Committee by permitting the Committee to conduct public hearings regarding (i) pharmaceutical assistance for Illinoisans who are not seniors and (ii) the safety, effectiveness, acquisition, distribution, and use of vaccines and other sera, prophylactics, and drugs that are of recognized efficiency in the diagnosis, prevention, and treatment of diseases. Contains provisions concerning reporting requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-PRESCRIPTION DRUG PROGRM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1183 | |
2010-07-22 | Effective Date July 22, 2010 | |
2010-07-22 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-19 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-24 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |