IL HB4920 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the earned income tax credit shall be: (i) 20% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2023 and prior to January 1, 2024; (ii) 22% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2024 and prior to January 1, 2025; and (iii) 25% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1 2025. Provides that the earned income tax credit is available to persons who have attained the age of 18 but have not yet attained the age of 25 and to persons who are 65 years of age or older, without regard to any age requirements that would otherwise apply to individuals without a qualifying child under federal Internal Revenue Code. Extends the earned income tax credit to individuals filing a return using an individual taxpayer identification number. Creates a child dependent tax credit that shall be not less than $600 when combined with the taxpayer's earned income tax credit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EARNED INCOME-AGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4920&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4920.htm |