IL HB4918 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish family resource centers throughout this State to provide counseling and mental health services to families who are indigent based on any behavior or mental health condition as determined by Department rule. Provides that the Department shall employ or contract with psychiatrists, clinical psychologists, clinical social workers, and licensed marriage and family therapists to provide those services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDSA-FAMILY RESOURCE CENTERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 015-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
405807-1New CodeSee Bill Text
40580Art. VII headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback