IL HB4916 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the provisions for prompt settlement of claims apply to a personal injury, property damage, wrongful death, tort, or other private action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PROCEDURE-PROMPT PAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-05-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-05-20SenateFirst Reading
2024-05-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2024-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 1, 2024
2024-04-30SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-25HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-04-18HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-039-000
2024-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2024-04-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-003-000
2024-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2024-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000
2024-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2024-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2024-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2024-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-2301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback