IL HB4915 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Beginning in taxable year 2010, increases the maximum income limitation under the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption from $55,000 to $75,000 for applicants who have occupied the residence for 5 years or more. Indexes the maximum income limitation to the Consumer Price Index. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
2010-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2010-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2010-03-15 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-25 Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger
2010-02-18 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
2010-02-18 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
2010-02-16 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger
2010-02-16 Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
2010-02-16 Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandy Cole
2010-02-16 Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kay Hatcher
2010-02-16 Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2010-02-16 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
2010-02-16 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
2010-02-16 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
2010-02-16 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2010-02-11 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
2010-02-03 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2010-01-15 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-01-15 First Reading
2010-01-13 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback