IL HB4914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that school-approved nonprofit dormitory or residence halls occupied in whole or in part by students who belong to fraternities, sororities, or other campus organizations are exempt. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-12 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |