IL HB4909 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that specified fees for birth record searches or certified copies of birth records shall be waived for all requests made by a youth in care, as defined in the Children and Family Services Act, or a person under the age of 27 who was a youth in care, as defined in the Children and Family Services Act, on or after his or her 18th birthday. Sets forth provisions concerning verification of a person's youth in care status. Provides that a person whose fees are waived must not be charged for verification. Provides that a person who knowingly or purposefully falsifies the verification is subject to a penalty of $100. Requires the State Registrar of Vital Records to establish standards and procedures for waiver of the applicable fees. Limits a person to no more than 4 birth records annually under these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BIRTH RECORDS-YOUTH IN CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 005-001-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41053525.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback