IL HB4907 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-03-25 - Effective Date March 21, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning PDPM STRIVE staffing ratio calculations for nursing facilities, provides that beginning January 1, 2025, the staffing percentage used in the calculation of the per diem staffing add-on shall be its PDPM STRIVE Staffing Ratio which equals: its Reported Total Nurse Staffing Hours Per Resident Per Day as published in the most recent federal staffing report (the Provider Information File), divided by the facility's PDPM STRIVE Staffing Target. Each facility's PDPM STRIVE Staffing Target is equal to .7122 times the facility's Illinois Adjusted Facility Case-Mix Hours Per Resident Per Day. Provides that a facility's Illinois Adjusted Facility Case Mix Hours Per Resident Per Day is equal to its Case-Mix Total Nurse Staffing Hours Per Resident Per Day (as published in the most recent federal staffing report Provider Information file) times 3.79 (which is the Reported Total Nurse Staffing Hours Per Resident Per Day for the Nation as reported the January 2024 State US Averages file), divided by the Reported Total Nurse Staffing Hours Per Resident Per Day for the Nation as reported in the most recent State US Averages file. Amends the Workforce Direct Care Expansion Act. Provides that the chair of the Behavioral Health Administrative Burden Task Force may designate an entity or entities (rather than a nongovernmental entity or entities) to provide administrative support (rather than pro bono administrative support) to the Task Force. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL REYES SYN REPORTING ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2025-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2025-01-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-25HouseEffective Date March 21, 2025
2025-03-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1075
2025-03-21HouseGovernor Approved
2025-01-22HouseSent to the Governor
2025-01-07HousePassed Both Houses
2025-01-07HouseHouse Concurs
2025-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-001
2025-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-001
2025-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2025-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2025-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2025-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2025-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2025-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2025-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel
2025-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel
2025-01-07HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2025-01-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2025-01-07HouseArrived in House
2025-01-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2025-01-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2025-01-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2025-01-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino
2025-01-06SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2025-01-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2025-01-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2025-01-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2025-01-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2025-01-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
2025-01-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 5, 2025
2025-01-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2024-12-22SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2024-11-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2024
2024-11-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2024-06-26SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
2024-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
2024-05-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2024-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-05-01SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
2024-05-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2024-04-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2024-04-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-30SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
2024-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2024-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 009-000-000
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Public Health Committee
2024-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410245ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4907&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4907.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4907eng.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4907enr.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/103/103-1075.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4907sam001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4907sam002.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300HB4907_04182024_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/senate/10300HB4907_01062025_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300HB4907sam002_01072025_004001C.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300HB4907sam001_01072025_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback