IL HB4900 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Generic Drug Pricing Fairness Act. Provides that a manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor shall not engage in price gouging in the sale of an essential off-patent or generic drug. Provides that the Director of Healthcare and Family Services or Director of Central Management Services may notify the Attorney General of any increase in the price of any essential off-patent or generic drug under the Medical Assistance Program under the Illinois Public Aid Code or a State health plan, respectively, that amounts to price gouging. Provides that whenever the Attorney General has reason to believe that a manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor of an essential off-patent or generic drug has violated the Act, the Attorney General shall send a notice to the manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor requesting a specified statement. Provides that within 45 days after receipt of the request, the manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor shall submit the statement to the Attorney General. Provides that to accomplish the objectives and carry out the duties prescribed in the Act, the Attorney General may issue subpoenas or examine under oath any person to determine whether a manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor has violated the Act. Provides that upon petition of the Attorney General, a circuit court may issue specified orders against violations of the Act. Contains provisions concerning the disclosure of financial information provided by a manufacturer or wholesale drug distributor to the Attorney General. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENERIC DRUG PRICING FAIRNESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Business Entities
2018-05-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-038-001
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-05HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-02HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-03-28HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-03-28HousePension Note Filed
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-27HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-26HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-26HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-26HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-26HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-26HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-01HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-01HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-03-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback