IL HB4895 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Human Services shall submit to the General Assembly a written report providing, at minimum, for each State-operated mental health center and State-operated developmental center: (1) the number of employees; (2) the number of patient or resident initiated workplace violence incidents which occurred, including the number which were a direct assault on staff and the number which were a violent incident to which staff responded; (3) the number of employees impacted in each incident; and (4) the rate of workplace violence that quarter expressed as total number of employees impacted to total number of employees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-REPORTS-STATE-MENT&DEV

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017054.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback