IL HB4892 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides that the Health Facilities and Services Review Board may approve the transfer of an existing permit without regard to whether the permit to be transferred has yet been financially committed, except for permits to establish a new facility or category of service. Provides requirements for the reporting of financial commitments by permit holders. Removes existing provisions regarding annual reporting by permit holders. Removes provisions concerning major construction projects. Modifies provisions regarding the application for permits or exemptions, and exemption regulations. Modifies provisions regarding the approval of a permit application. Modifies the powers and duties of the Board and Board staff. Makes changes regarding the revision of criteria, standards, and rules; the giving of written notice of the reduction in hospital service; and issues concerning bed inventory. Makes specified provisions concerning fines for permit holders also apply to exemption holders under the Act. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH FACILITIES PLANNING ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20396010Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012.3Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012.4Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012.5Amended CodeCitation Text
20396013Amended CodeCitation Text
20396014.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2039604Amended CodeCitation Text
2039604.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039605Amended CodeCitation Text
2039605.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039605.3Amended CodeCitation Text
2039606Amended CodeCitation Text
2039606.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039607Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback