IL HB4889 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Modifies the language of the petition nomination form for candidates. Provides that a candidate for an office must certify that he or she has not exceeded any limitations on the number of terms that he or she may serve for the office. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-NOMINATION PETITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1057-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback