IL HB4888 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall collect and report specified data regarding violence within Department institutions and facilities. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall collect and report specified data regarding public safety of released committed persons. Provides that the data shall be published not less than once each quarter and published with an aggregate chart at the agency level and individual reports by each correctional institution or facility of the Department of Corrections. Provides that the Director of Corrections shall ensure that the agency level data is reviewed by the Director's executive team on a quarterly basis. Provides that the correctional institution or facility's executive team and each chief administrative officer of the correctional institution or facility shall examine statewide and local data at least quarterly. Provides that during these reviews each chief administrative officer shall: (1) identify trends; (2) develop action items to mitigate the root causes of violence; and (3) establish committees at each correctional institution or facility which shall review the violence data on a quarterly basis and develop action plans to reduce violence. These plans shall include a wide range of strategies to incentivize good conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-DOC-REPORTS-VIOLENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-17HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-17HouseArrived in House
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-03SenateRe-referred to State Government
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2-12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback