IL HB4887 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to assist youth in care in identifying and obtaining documents necessary to function as an independent adult prior to the closure of the youth's case to terminate wardship under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the necessary documents shall include, but not be limited to: State identification card or driver's license; social security card; medical records; educational records; and other documents. Provides that if a court orders that the wardship of a youth in care be terminated and all proceedings under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 respecting the youth in care finally closed and discharged, the Department shall ensure that the youth in care has a copy of the court's order. Provides that a court shall find that it is in the minor's best interest to continue wardship of a minor if the Department of Children and Family Services has not made reasonable efforts to ensure that the minor has documents necessary for adult living. Provides that it shall not be in the minor's best interest to terminate wardship of a minor over the age of 18 who is in the Department's guardianship if the Department has not made reasonable efforts to ensure that the minor has documents necessary for adult living.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-YOUTH-NECESSARY DOCUMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-23HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050535.10New CodeSee Bill Text
7054052-31Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback