IL HB4883 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a barber or teacher of barbering may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of barbering. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a cosmetologist or teacher of cosmetology may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of cosmetology. Provides that an applicant for licensure as an esthetician or teacher of esthetics may take the licensure examination after completing 600 hours in the study of esthetics. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a nail technician or teacher of nail technology may take the licensure examination after completing 280 hours in the study of nail technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BARBER/COSMETOLOGY-EXAMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0642
2018-07-27HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-27HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-19HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254102-7Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103-6Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103C-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback