IL HB4882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grow Your Own Teacher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 010-001-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-047-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110481Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback