IL HB4882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 8:30 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grow Your Own Teacher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110481Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback