IL HB4882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grow Your Own Teacher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-11-14 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Lost 061-045-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-001-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-047-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 48 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |