IL HB4873 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Payday Loan Reform Act. Authorizes a lender to charge a borrower for the verification that the proposed loan agreement is permissible: a fee not to exceed $1 for a payday loan or a fee not to exceed $1 for each month that a balance is scheduled to be outstanding on an installment payday loan (rather than a fee not to exceed $1). Authorizes a certified consumer reporting service to charge the following verification fees upon a loan being made or entered into a certified database: a fee not to exceed $1 for a payday loan or a fee not to exceed $1 for each month that a balance is scheduled to be outstanding on an installment payday loan (rather than a fee not to exceed $1). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAYDAY INSTALLMENT LOAN FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-30SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-043-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8151222-10Amended CodeCitation Text
8151222-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback