IL HB4870 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school to authorize a parent or guardian of a student who is a qualifying patient to administer a medical cannabis infused product to the student on school premises or a school bus if both the student (as a qualifying patient) and the parent or guardian (as a designated caregiver) have been issued registry identification cards under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Defines terms. Provides that a parent or guardian may not administer a medical cannabis infused product if the administration would create disruption to the school's educational environment or would cause exposure of the product to other students. Provides that nothing in the provision requires a member of the school's staff to administer a medical cannabis infused product to a student. Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MEDICAL CANNABIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 009-001-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Education
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-001-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-33New CodeSee Bill Text
41013030Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback