IL HB4864 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Removes the requirement for each food service establishment to be under the operational supervision of a certified food service sanitation manager. Changes references from "certified food service sanitation manager" to "certified food protection manager" and makes related changes. Removes provisions requiring the Department of Public Health to be involved in the certification process. Amends the State Officers and Employees Money Disposition Act and Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act to make corresponding changes. Makes other changes.
Title
FOOD PROTECTION MANAGER CERT
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 230 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 130 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 3.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 3.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 625 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4864&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4864.htm |