IL HB4864 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing Act. Provides that a qualified applicant for licensure as a professional counselor must be a graduate of a master's or doctoral level program in the field of counseling, rehabilitation counseling, psychology, or similar degree program approved by the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
PROF COUNSELOR-EDUCATION
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1139 | |
2010-07-21 | Effective Date July 21, 2010 | |
2010-07-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |