IL HB4858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Industrial Development Assistance Law. Allows local school districts and community colleges to apply for and receive grants under the Act for the acquisition of land, construction of facilities, and purchase of equipment, dedicated solely to the instruction of occupations in manufacturing. Provides additional eligibility requirements for local school districts and community colleges applying for grants under the Act. Modifies the term "industrial development agency" to include local school districts and community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INDUSTRY DEVELOPMNT ASSISTANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
307203Amended CodeCitation Text
307206Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback