IL HB4855 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Defines "patient" for purposes of the Act. Provides that renewal applications shall be approved or denied within 60 business days, provided the applicant submitted his or her renewal application prior to the expiration of his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card. Provides that if a renewal application has been submitted prior to the expiration date of the applicant's Firearm Owner's Identification Card, the Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall remain valid while the Department processes the application, unless the person is subject to or becomes subject to revocation under the Act. Provides that the cost for a renewal application shall be $10 which shall be deposited into the State Police Firearm Services Fund. Provides that the Department of State Police may, by rule in a manner consistent with the Department's rules concerning revocation, provide for the suspension of the Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a person whose Firearm Owner's Identification Card is subject to revocation and seizure under the Act for the duration of the disqualification if the disqualification is not a permanent grounds for revocation of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card under the Act. Provides that the cost for replacement of a lost, destroyed, or stolen card shall be $5 if the loss, destruction, or theft of the card is reported to the Department of State Police. Provides the fee shall be deposited into the State Police Firearm Services Fund. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID-RENEWAL & SUSPENSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-004-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-17HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-17HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4306513.2Amended CodeCitation Text
430655Amended CodeCitation Text
430657Amended CodeCitation Text
430658.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback