IL HB4852 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning no later than October 1, 2018, and for each State fiscal year thereafter, the monthly personal needs allowance required under Title XIX of the Social Security Act for any person residing in a facility licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance under the Code and who is enrolled in the State's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver Program for adults with developmental disabilities shall be no less than 15% of the individual's monthly Supplemental Security Income benefits or Social Security Disability Insurance benefits, or both, for the previous calendar year. Establishes a similar personal needs allowance amount for any person residing in a facility licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance under the Code beginning no later than October 1, 2018 and for each State fiscal year thereafter. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-36New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback