IL HB4852 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning no later than October 1, 2018, and for each State fiscal year thereafter, the monthly personal needs allowance required under Title XIX of the Social Security Act for any person residing in a facility licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance under the Code and who is enrolled in the State's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver Program for adults with developmental disabilities shall be no less than 15% of the individual's monthly Supplemental Security Income benefits or Social Security Disability Insurance benefits, or both, for the previous calendar year. Establishes a similar personal needs allowance amount for any person residing in a facility licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance under the Code beginning no later than October 1, 2018 and for each State fiscal year thereafter. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4852&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4852.htm |