IL HB4851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a licensee under the Act who is a current member of the General Assembly or a State employee may carry a concealed weapon on State property, except he or she shall not carry a concealed weapon on the grounds of the Capitol Complex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-EXEMPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTabled
2018-04-12HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback