IL HB4848 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of the law in recognition of service provided, a health care facility or health care practitioner shall provide without charge one complete copy of a patient's records if: (1) the patient is an indigent homeless veteran; and (2) the records are being requested by the patient or a person, entity, or organization presenting a valid authorization for the release of records signed by the patient or the patient's legally authorized representative, for the purpose of supporting a claim for federal veterans' disability benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS-MEDICAL RECORD COPIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-07HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73558-2001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback