IL HB4848 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0814
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0814
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of the law in recognition of service provided, a health care facility or health care practitioner shall provide without charge one complete copy of a patient's records if: (1) the patient is an indigent homeless veteran; and (2) the records are being requested by the patient or a person, entity, or organization presenting a valid authorization for the release of records signed by the patient or the patient's legally authorized representative, for the purpose of supporting a claim for federal veterans' disability benefits.
Title
VETERANS-MEDICAL RECORD COPIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0814 |
2018-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 8-2001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |