IL HB4847 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person is not accountable for the conduct of another if he or she was subjected to specific and credible coercion, compulsion, duress, or threats. Provides that no offense is excepted from the provision that a person is not guilty of an offense by reason of conduct that he or she performs under the compulsion of threat or menace of the imminent infliction of death or great bodily harm, if he or she reasonably believes death or great bodily harm will be inflicted upon him or her, or upon his or her spouse or child, if he or she does not perform that conduct. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. In a provision concerning relief from judgments, changes the allegations a movant must establish when presenting a meritorious claim to: (1) the movant was convicted of a forcible felony; (2) the movant's participation in the offense was related to experiencing or the effects of gender-based violence; and (3) no substantial evidence or incomplete evidence of gender-based violence against the movant was presented at the movant's sentencing hearing. Changes the term "domestic violence" to "gender-based violence". Removes the definition of "intimate partner". Makes corresponding changes.
Title
CRIM-ACCOUNTABILITY-RELIEF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-037-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 5-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 7-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |