IL HB4846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0858
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a violation (rather than a second or subsequent violation) of a provision in the Code governing the use of an electronic communication device while operating a motor vehicle is an offense against traffic regulations governing the movement of vehicles. Removes a provision providing that a person who violates the governing provision shall be fined a maximum of $75 for a first offense, $100 for a second offense, $125 for a third offense, and $150 for a fourth or subsequent offense. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-ELECTRONIC DEVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0858
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date July 1, 2019
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-015-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625512-610.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback