IL HB4844 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that, for purposes of treatment in the early stages of a mental health condition, a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed shall provide coverage for the treatment of serious mental illnesses and serious emotional disturbances. Provides that coverage shall include, but not be limited to, certain evidence-based and evidence-informed bundled treatment approaches. Provides that payment for the services performed under the treatment models shall be based on all the components of the treatment model combined, rather than for each separate service. Provides that disability or functional impairment shall not be a precondition to receive treatment under the provisions. Provides that if federal regulations require the State to defray the cost of coverage for serious mental illnesses or serious emotional disturbances, then the provisions are inoperative and the State shall not assume any obligation for the cost of the coverage. Makes conforming changes in the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Fair Insurance Coverage for Early Treatment of Serious Mental Health Conditions Act. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-SERIOUS MENTAL ILLNESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4844&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4844.htm |