IL HB4843 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Ivory Ban Act. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to import, sell, offer for sale, purchase, barter, or possess with intent to sell, any ivory, ivory product, rhinoceros horn, or rhinoceros horn product. Provides that these provisions do not apply to specified antique weapons or musical instruments. Establishes penalties for violation of the Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may permit, under terms and conditions as the Department may adopt by rule, the import, sale, offer for sale, purchase, barter, or possession with intent to sell, of any ivory, ivory product, rhinoceros horn, or rhinoceros horn product for bona fide educational or scientific purposes, unless this activity is prohibited by federal law. Provides that the Department may adopt any rules necessary for the implementation of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IVORY BAN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-001
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-044-001
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2018-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback