IL HB4840 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides for specified rights of complainants under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-RIGHTS OF COMPLAINANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-13HouseTabled
2018-04-13HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-13HouseMotion Do Not Pass Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54301-5Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-70New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback