IL HB4837 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1309
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1309
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that municipalities having bonded debt in the amount of $5,000,000 or more and municipalities with a population of 200 or more that have bonded debt in any amount or that own or operate a public utility (instead of all municipalities that have bonded debt or that own or operate a public utility) shall be audited annually. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-AUDITS
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1309 | |
2010-07-27 | Effective Date July 27, 2010 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 096-020-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 006-003-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Reis | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-12 | First Reading | |
2010-04-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-023-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-23 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 008-001-000 | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2010-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis | |
2010-03-18 | Home Rule Note Filed | |
2010-03-16 | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-16 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-16 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-02 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-002-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |