IL HB4836 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that in one's "own home" means that an adult with a mental disability lives alone; or that an adult with a mental disability is in full-time residence with his or her parents, legal guardian, or other relatives; or that an adult with a mental disability is in full-time residence in a setting not subject to licensure under the Nursing Home Care Act, the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013, the ID/DD Community Care Act, the MC/DD Act, or the Child Care Act of 1969 with 5 (rather than 3) or fewer other adults unrelated to the adult with a mental disability who do not provide home-based services to the adult with a mental disability.
Title
MHDDSA-ONE'S OWN HOME-DEFINED
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] |
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 004-006-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-013-002 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-001-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 003-002-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 80 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |