IL HB4836 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that in one's "own home" means that an adult with a mental disability lives alone; or that an adult with a mental disability is in full-time residence with his or her parents, legal guardian, or other relatives; or that an adult with a mental disability is in full-time residence in a setting not subject to licensure under the Nursing Home Care Act, the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013, the ID/DD Community Care Act, the MC/DD Act, or the Child Care Act of 1969 with 5 (rather than 3) or fewer other adults unrelated to the adult with a mental disability who do not provide home-based services to the adult with a mental disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDSA-ONE'S OWN HOME-DEFINED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass Human Services; 004-006-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-013-002
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-001-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 003-002-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
405802-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback