IL HB4835 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safety Moratorium on Carbon Dioxide Pipelines Act. Establishes a temporary statewide moratorium on construction of carbon dioxide pipelines until the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration has adopted revised federal safety standards for transportation of carbon dioxide and the State has commissioned and finalized a relevant study regarding the safety setbacks required in the event of pipeline rupture or leak. Requires the State study to include input from first responders, to analyze pipeline ruptures or leaks in a variety of settings, and to recommend setbacks and funding based on that analysis. Provides that pending applications for carbon dioxide pipelines shall be held in abeyance. Provides for expiration of the temporary moratorium after 4 years, or when new safety standards are established, or upon enactment of a law that meets certain criteria. Makes legislative findings. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
CO2 PIPELINE MORATORIUM
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] |
Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-006-000 |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-03-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4835&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4835.htm |