IL HB4830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the maximum amount of the education expense credit to $1,500 (currently, $750). Adds athletic fees, driver's education fees, and fees and costs associated with certain out-of-school activities to the list of qualified education expenses. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4830&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4830.htm |